skip to content

Chow, Chuen-Bik

CPSO#: 26354

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Feb 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone: 519-279-4098
Fax: 519-279-4099 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C.-B. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow ( CPSO# 26354 )

Business Address:
110 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone Number: 519-2794098

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 203 99 Northfield Drive Waterloo ON N2K 3P9 Tel: (519) 584-2183
Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Joy Singh
Date Received: 18 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHUEN-BIK CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017