skip to content

Choudhry, Netan

CPSO#: 96870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Georgetown University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vitreous Retina Macula
Specialists of Toronto
3280 Bloor St. W. Suite 310
Etobicoke, ON M8X 2X4
Toronto ON  M8X 2X3
Phone: 647-361-7575
Fax: 647-361-4585 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Netan Choudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Choudhry ( CPSO# 96870 )

Business Address:
3280 Bloor Street West
Suite 310
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2X3
Phone Number: (647) 361-7575

Business Address:
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 388-9505

Business Address:
C3-270 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 845-4740


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2014 Active
             Dr. Netan Choudhry may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology, only.