skip to content

Choudhary, Badar Un Nisa

CPSO#: 96892

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712 Ext. 3096
Fax: (519) 641-6189 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Badar Choudhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Apr 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BADAR UN NISA CHOUDHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUDHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014