skip to content

Chou, Roger

CPSO#: 89351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of New South Wales, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1315 Finch ave W
Toronto ON  M3J 2G6
Phone: 416 6334441 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roger Chou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jong ( CPSO# 86536 )
Dr. R. Chou ( CPSO# 89351 )

Business Address:
114-1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 633-4441


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROGER CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014