skip to content

Choptiany, Maxym Ihor

CPSO#: 91618

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health - Queen Street Site
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501 Ext. 31158 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M1G3
Canada
Phone: (705) 549-3181
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

160 Horner Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 0C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 354-4030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 6
1100 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 943-6284
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maxym Choptiany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Choptiany ( CPSO# 91618 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAXYM IHOR CHOPTIANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPTIANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014