skip to content

Chopra, Justin Amitoj

CPSO#: 92865

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: (647)723-7554 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N6
Canada
Phone: 416-626-2138
Fax: 647-723-7554
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905 848 7557
Fax: 647 723 7554
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Amitoj Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chopra ( CPSO# 92865 )

Business Address:
200 Sherway Dr
The Dorothy Ley Hospice
Palliative Care Physicians
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N6
Phone Number: 4166260116

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Division of Palliative Care
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: 905 848 7557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTIN AMITOJ CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012