skip to content

Chopra, Angeli

CPSO#: 92081

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dayanand Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
EL - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 02 May 2013 to 09 Jun 2013
EL - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2013