skip to content

Choong, Albert Poh Soon

CPSO#: 25262

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jan 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: January 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Albert Poh Soon Choong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 30, 2018:

Dr. Choong was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. Dr. Choong resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)