skip to content

Chong, John Peter

CPSO#: 31249

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Dec 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
Suite 201
565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone: (905) 574-5444
Fax: (905) 574-1119 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Musicians' Clinic of Canada
340-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 966-8742
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chong ( CPSO# 31249 )

Business Address:
Sir William Osler Health Institute
Musicians' Clinics of Canada
201 - 565 Sanatorium Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 574-5444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 02 Apr 2019 Active
 

            As from April 2, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Peter Chong in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Chong to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. JOHN PETER CHONG
                                             ("Dr. CHONG")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chong, certificate of registration number 31249, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 104586 and 7216197 (the "Investigations") into
                  whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
                  occupational medicine practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 



            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall provide only short-term
                        psychotherapy, to a maximum of 12 sessions per patient;
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall ensure that each of my
                        patients has a primary care provider and shall not initiate or
                        continue a treating relationship with any patient until I receive
                        confirmation that the patient has a primary care provider;
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I shall provide regular consultation
                        reports to the patient's primary care provider, and will report any
                        and all medications prescribed to the patient's primary care
                        provider.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or 
                        "Clinical Supervisors"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every week for two (2) months
                              and once every months for ten (10) months thereafter;
                        (iv)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                        (v)   Observe at least three (3) clinical encounters at every
                              meeting;
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              observation;
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              week for two (2) months and once every months for ten (10)
                              months thereafter, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the reports of the medical
                        inspector dated October 10, 2018 and January 6, 2019, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to successfully complete all aspects of the
                        detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the
                        following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safer
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                        (ii)  A CPD program in basic psychotherapy providing a minimum of
                              12 contact hours of instruction, to be approved by the
                              College;
                        (iii) University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record-Keeping:  http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                        (iv)  CMPA e-learning modules: Documentation: Charting Medical
                              Records and Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record
                              Keeping;
                        (v)   a written summary of approximately 2-4 pages or 2000 words of
                              the CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy
                              /Medical-Records; and
                        (vi)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                              3.    Choosing Wisely Canada recommendations for imaging for
                                    low back pain:
                                    https://choosingwiselycanada.org/wp-content/uploads/2017/05/Low-Back-Pain-EN.pdf;
                              4.    CPSO Policy "Maintaining Appropriate Boundaries and
                                    Preventing Sexual Abuse":
                                    https://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Maintaining-Appropriate-Boundaries-and-Preventing;
                                    and
                        (vii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to complete this requirement by June 30,
                        2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chong, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chong
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              his occupational medicine practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Chong shall provide only short-term psychotherapy, to a
                              maximum of 12 sessions per patient;
                  
                              Dr. Chong shall ensure that all of his patients have primary
                              care providers and shall not initiate or continue a treating
                              relationship with any patient until he receives confirmation
                              that the patient has a primary care provider. 
                  
                              Dr. Chong shall provide regular consultation reports to the
                              patient's primary care provider, and shall report any and all
                              medications prescribed to the patient's primary care
                              provider.
                  
                              Dr. Chong will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months. 
                  
                              Dr. Chong will engage in professional education in
                              psychotherapy, prescribing, recordkeeping and boundaries.
                  
                              Dr. Chong's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College approximately six months after the
                              end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Chong, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 2, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Peter Chong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 2, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Chong engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his occupational medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Chong shall provide only short-term psychotherapy, to a maximum of 12 sessions per patient;

Dr. Chong shall ensure that all of his patients have primary care providers and shall not initiate or continue a treating relationship with any patient until he receives confirmation that the patient has a primary care provider.

Dr. Chong shall provide regular consultation reports to the patient's primary care provider, and shall report any and all medications prescribed to the patient's primary care provider.

Dr. Chong will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months.

Dr. Chong will engage in professional education in psychotherapy, prescribing, recordkeeping and boundaries.

Dr. Chong's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 2, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 2, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On November 25, 2016 at the Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. John Peter Chong in respect of an incident that took place in July 2009.