skip to content

Chong, Donald Ton

CPSO#: 22126

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Feb 2015