skip to content

Choi, Jacquelyn Shuk Wah

CPSO#: 98456

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Angeline Street North
Suite 9
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 324-8212
Fax: (705) 324-8223 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jacquelyn S.W. Choi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Choi ( CPSO# 98456 )

Business Address:
9 - 65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 324-8212

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8

Business Address:
225 Mary Street
Lindsay ON  K9V 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 324-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACQUELYN SHUK WAH CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014