skip to content

Cho, Dennis Dane

CPSO#: 98001

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
RFE Building, Ground Floor
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Fax: 416-340-4300 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Cho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cho ( CPSO# 98001 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
RFE Building, Ground Floor
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENNIS DANE CHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017