skip to content

Chllamma, Muralidharan Krishnan

CPSO#: 98525

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 2015
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 14 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Med Oncology and Haematolgy
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3469 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chllamma ( CPSO# 98525 )
Dr. C. Deb ( CPSO# 98800 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology and Haematolgy
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURALIDHARAN KRISHNAN CHLLAMMA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHLLAMMA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CHLLAMMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHLLAMMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CHLLAMMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHLLAMMA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHLLAMMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020