skip to content

Chiu, Kin-Yan Brian

CPSO#: 30486

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5B4.14 WC Mackenzie Centre
UA Hospital
8400 - 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-6959
Fax: (780) 407-3009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIN-YAN BRIAN CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1987