skip to content

Chiu, Hannah Hiu-Yan

CPSO#: 95738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
7900 Hurontario St
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: (416) 292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 221
2180 Steeles Ave West
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-292-0330
Fax: 416-292-0331
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Canada
Phone: 416-760-8763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hannah H. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chiu ( CPSO# 95738 )

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANNAH HIU-YAN CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016