skip to content

Chiu, Hak Ming

CPSO#: 25192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Record Department Lakeridge Health Oshawa 1 Hospital Court Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016