skip to content

Chiu, Aiy-Wa

CPSO#: 22404

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: 105 Page Avenue North York, ON M2K 2B8
Date Received: 20 Dec 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 2012