skip to content

Chittal, Shashikant Madhav

CPSO#: 26416

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Oct 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective:21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1972 to 30 Jun 1972
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2004