skip to content

Chisholm, Robert James

CPSO#: 23951

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5490
Fax: (416) 864-5478 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert J. Chisholm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chisholm ( CPSO# 23951 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Room 7 152
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5490

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES CHISHOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISHOLM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971