skip to content

Chiramel, George Koshy

CPSO#: 98630

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Medical Imaging
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6026 Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014