skip to content

Chinner, Anthony Joseph

CPSO#: 24180

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Feb 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Xhosa

Education:University of Cape Town, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Records pertaining to 1371 Neilson Road practice location can be accessed via: Records Access Services Canada, Inc. 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia ON N7W 1A4 Tel: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 102
Date Received: 20 Sep 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anthony Joseph Chinner to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 22, 2017:

Dr. Chinner was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Chinner resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)