skip to content

Chingkoe, Christina Marie

CPSO#: 93810

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

1815 Ironstone Manor Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W3W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christina Chingkoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chingkoe ( CPSO# 93810 )

Business Address:
Ellesmere x-Ray Associates
1815 Ironstone Manor
Suite 15B
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Pickering ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2S4

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE CHINGKOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHINGKOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016