skip to content

Chin, Melissa Yarr Wern

CPSO#: 95094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine D2-309
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58525 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yeyao Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chin ( CPSO# 95094 )
Dr. Y. Yu ( CPSO# 95377 )

Business Address:
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Business Address:
E5-800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8078

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA YARR WERN CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017