skip to content

Chin, Melanie Patricia

CPSO#: 97017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Melanie Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chin ( CPSO# 97017 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE PATRICIA CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Jul 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Respirology

University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2015