skip to content

Chin, Ami Jun-Yee

CPSO#: 91479

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Hospital
Dept. of Care of the Elderly
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ami Chin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chin ( CPSO# 91479 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMI JUN-YEE CHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012