skip to content

Child, Dumaresq Marner

CPSO#: 21208

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Sep 2023
EXPIRY DATE
20 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: English Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. D.M. Child Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 2023

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 27, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of September 12, 2018: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On July 27, 2017, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Dumaresq Child to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Child to:

Practice under low-level clinical supervision for a period of four months.

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the October 19, 2017, Medical Record Keeping Course at the University of Toronto.

Review Guidelines and Policies as outlined below:
o Medical Records Policy
o Canadian Task Force on Periodic Health Examinations
o Article from American Family Physician of Prostate Cancer Screening
o Guidelines on Cognitive Impairment: Recognition, Diagnosis, and Management in Primary Care.

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan.