skip to content

Chih, Sharon Shiaw Yun

CPSO#: 92667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
31 May 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-1295
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7327
Fax: (613) 696-7359 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:17 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jan 2012
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 May 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2021 Active
 1. Dr. Sharon Shiaw Yun Chih may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Chih holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Chih no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on June 17, 2014, and expires on May 31, 2022. Upon renewal of Dr. Chih's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.