skip to content

Chiew, Soon Kwang

CPSO#: 85978

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A, First Place Plaza
Fourth Avenue Cardiac Clinic
300 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone: (905) 935-1010
Fax: (905) 641-5096 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Catharines Hospital
Department of Cardiology
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.K. Chiew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chiew ( CPSO# 85978 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 1A
300E Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Phone Number: (905) 935-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOON KWANG CHIEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Mar 2007 to 01 Apr 2007
EL - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012