skip to content

Chick, John Michael

CPSO#: 21304

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Date of Death: 19-Aug-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006