skip to content

Chiang, Jackie Ka Lon

CPSO#: 88713

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Bloorview
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220 Ext. 6343 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-7500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACKIE KA LON CHIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013