skip to content

Chhibber, Siddharth

CPSO#: 89738

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital - DI Dep
46 General Hospital Road
Stratford, ON
N5A 2Y8
London ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: 519-272-8210 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Siddharth Chhibber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhibber ( CPSO# 89738 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIDDHARTH CHHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHIBBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 13 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 14 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014