skip to content

Chhabra, Mehtaab Kaur

CPSO#: 96005

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Uppal, Mehtaab Kaur (used until: 22 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.K. Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

Western University, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2019