skip to content

Chhabra, Aneesh Paul

CPSO#: 96320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 249-8111 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aneesh Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chhabra ( CPSO# 96320 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANEESH PAUL CHHABRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHABRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014