skip to content

Cheung, Winson Yat Tak

CPSO#: 84816

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2009