skip to content

Cheung, Wai Ming

CPSO#: 21814

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Dalhousie University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: PO Box 87674 298 John Street Thornhill, ON L3T 7R4
Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: Dr. W.M. Cheung Fax: 905-764-1307
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013


Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may write to: 390 Highlen Avenue Markham, ON L3S 4J3
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013