skip to content

Cheung, Thomas

CPSO#: 95457

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

569 King St E
Toronto ON  M5A 1M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 901-6672
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thomas Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 05 Apr 2022 Active
 As from April 5, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Cheung, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cheung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. THOMAS CHEUNG
("Dr. Cheung")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Cheung, certificate of registration number 95457, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-361575-V5R6K4 (the "Investigation") into my care of a patient in my emergency medicine practice.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Medical Record-Keeping Program, University of Toronto;

(ii)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policy and other self-study:    
        
1.	Medical Records Documentation, College Policy;

2.	Evaluation of the adult with abdominal pain in the emergency department, UpToDate;

3.	Acute appendicitis in adults: Diagnostic evaluation, UpToDate;

4.	Assessing Abdominal Pain in Adults: A Rational, Cost-Effective, and Evidence-Based Strategy, UpToDate;

5.	Missed appendicitis, PSNET; and

6.	Appendicitis: Why Do We Miss It, and How Do We Improve?, EMDocs.

(b)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(6)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (5) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Cheung, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Cheung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Cheung's care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Cheung will engage in professional education in record-keeping, and the assessment and management of abdominal pain. 

Dr. Cheung's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of completion of the professional education.

(c)	I, Dr. Cheung, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Cheung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and/or to all Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Cheung, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Cheung, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(d)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 5, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Cheung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 5, 2022:   

 

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Cheung’s care of a patient in his emergency medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:



Dr. Cheung will engage in professional education in record-keeping, and the assessment and management of abdominal pain.



Dr. Cheung’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of completion of the professional education.