skip to content

Cheung, Roderick Ting Fung

CPSO#: 90774

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
142-C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H6
Phone: (705) 371-2220 Ext. 6055
Fax: (855) 904-3697 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Roderick Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cheung ( CPSO# 90774 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3J4
Phone Number: (705) 335-2051

Business Address:
142-C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N H6
Phone Number: 7053712220

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RODERICK TING FUNG CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012