skip to content

Cheung, Paul Kar-Chun

CPSO#: 96639

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Equipe De Sante Familiale
Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 813-3850 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul K. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cheung ( CPSO# 96639 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Equipe De Sante Familiale Credit Valley
Suite 302
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL KAR-CHUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012