skip to content

Cheung, Hym Dun

CPSO#: 25850

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 310
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-3918
Fax: (905) 472-3919 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.D. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cheung ( CPSO# 25850 )

Business Address:
Ashgrove Medical Centre
310 - 6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-3918

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HYM DUN CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 1, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective October 17, 2019, Dr. Cheung has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)