skip to content

Cheung, Caroline Marie

CPSO#: 94531

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Caroline Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cheung ( CPSO# 94531 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 29 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013