skip to content

Cheung, Angela Catherine

CPSO#: 86948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 77182
Fax: 613-737-6107 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Angela C. Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA CATHERINE CHEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2020