skip to content

Chess, David Gordon

CPSO#: 32948

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 26 2014 vallerun boulevard
London ON  N6G 5N8
Phone: (519) 8545456 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David G. Chess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chess ( CPSO# 32948 )

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019