skip to content

Chesney, Amy Louise

CPSO#: 84642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amy Chesney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chesney ( CPSO# 84642 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY LOUISE CHESNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHESNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012