Chertkow, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 97948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Family Practice
77 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Team BLUE
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. Ext. 1, 4
Fax: (416) 323-6402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Chertkow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chertkow ( CPSO# 97948 )

Business Address:
Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone Number: (416) 481-1173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014