skip to content

Cheng, James Jin

CPSO#: 98322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 98322 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 898-8966

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES JIN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017