skip to content

Cheng, Elaine Vivian

CPSO#: 90773

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Riverdale CHC
955 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 3P3
Phone: 4164612493
Fax: 4164618245 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELAINE VIVIAN CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011