skip to content

Cheng, Anita King-Lum

CPSO#: 86513

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Neonatology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64361 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anita Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheng ( CPSO# 86513 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Department of Neonatology
800 Commisssioners Road East
D4-200
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANITA KING-LUM CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011