skip to content

Chen, Yu-Jen Ian

CPSO#: 91669

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:COLL OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE & SURGERY, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Adolescent Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2018