skip to content

Chen, Richard Chu Tak

CPSO#: 24083

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Durham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 400 71 King Street West Mississauga, ON L5B 4A2
Instructions: Medical records in care of Dr. Carnat
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014