skip to content

Chen, Innie

CPSO#: 90061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, French, Mandarin

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 81725 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Innie Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chen ( CPSO# 90061 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Shirley E. Greenberg Women`s Health Centre
Suite 7236-3
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. INNIE CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2008 to 09 Jan 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 04 Apr 2011 to 01 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 02 May 2011 to 29 May 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 30 May 2011 to 24 Jun 2011
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 28 Jan 2013 to 08 Feb 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2013